NY A07636 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - APPROVAL MEMO.94
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - APPROVAL MEMO.94
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes in the city of New York, for certain public work undertaken pursuant to project labor agreements, use of the alternative delivery method known as design-build contracts.
Title
Authorizes in the city of New York, for certain public work undertaken pursuant to project labor agreements, use of the alternative delivery method known as design-build contracts.
Sponsors
Asm. Edward Braunstein [D] | Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D] | Asm. Charles Fall [D] | Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D] |
Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Simcha Eichenstein [D] | Asm. Michael DenDekker [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-31 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.94 |
2019-12-31 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.749 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.511 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | substituted for a7636b |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1668 |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6293A |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s6293a |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.511 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.511 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 7636b |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | print number 7636a |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to rules |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S06293 (Same As) 2019-12-31 - APPROVAL MEMO.94