NY A07637 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - print number 7637a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - print number 7637a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to promotions of lieutenants; grants a lieutenant who has served for a period of fifteen years the same rights in respect to the police pension fund as a lieutenant detailed to act as lieutenant commander detective squad, or lieutenant special assignment.
Title
Relates to promotions of lieutenants; grants a lieutenant who has served for a period of fifteen years the same rights in respect to the police pension fund as a lieutenant detailed to act as lieutenant commander detective squad, or lieutenant special assignment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Assembly | print number 7637a |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05658 (Same As) 2020-03-18 - PRINT NUMBER 5658A