NY A07644 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - substituted by s2198
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the definition of qualified agencies; adds public defenders, legal aid societies, and assigned counsel administrators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the definition of qualified agencies; adds public defenders, legal aid societies, and assigned counsel administrators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted by s2198
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.401
2019-06-17Assemblyrules report cal.401
2019-06-17Assemblyreported
2019-06-13Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-06Assemblyreference changed to codes
2019-05-14Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S02198 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback