NY A07646 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - approval memo.34
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - approval memo.34
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to ensuring paid employees of a county airport or county aviation department which perform fire response or fire rescue duties are eligible for equal benefits as other paid firefighters.
Title
Relates to ensuring paid employees of a county airport or county aviation department which perform fire response or fire rescue duties are eligible for equal benefits as other paid firefighters.
Sponsors
Asm. Harry Bronson [D] | Asm. Jamie Romeo [D] | Asm. Mark Johns [R] | Asm. Brian Kolb [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Senate | approval memo.34 |
2020-12-15 | Senate | signed chap.325 |
2020-12-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.888 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6144A |
2020-07-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.171 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.171 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-07-11 | Assembly | print number 7646a |
2020-07-11 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06144 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - approval memo.34