NY A07648 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - signed chap.173
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - signed chap.173
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a residency exemption for plumbing inspectors in the city of Jamestown by allowing such inspectors to be residents of Chautauqua county.
Title
Provides a residency exemption for plumbing inspectors in the city of Jamestown by allowing such inspectors to be residents of Chautauqua county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | Senate | signed chap.173 |
2020-09-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.708 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7538 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.284 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.691 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.691 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S07538 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - signed chap.173