NY A07654 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - signed chap.67
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes boards of cooperative educational services to enter into certain contracts with out-of-state schools related to existing technology products, including computer programs and software packages that help students learn and assist districts with achieving greater efficiencies; defines "out-of-state public school"; changes the term "common core" to "next generation" standards or curriculum.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes boards of cooperative educational services to enter into certain contracts with out-of-state schools related to existing technology products, including computer programs and software packages that help students learn and assist districts with achieving greater efficiencies; defines "out-of-state public school"; changes the term "common core" to "next generation" standards or curriculum.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03Senatesigned chap.67
2019-06-28Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-06-12SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-12Senate3RD READING CAL.1053
2019-06-12SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5636A
2019-06-03SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-03Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-03Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-30Assemblyamended on third reading 7654a
2019-05-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.459
2019-05-21Assemblyreported
2019-05-14Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S05636 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7654A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07654&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07654&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07654
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07654&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07654A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07654&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07654&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A7654#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback