NY A07658 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - print number 7658b
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - print number 7658b
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing voice communication service to incarcerated people in state correctional facilities at no cost; requires agencies charged with the operation and management of state correctional facilities and juvenile detention facilities to provide persons in their custody with voice communication service at a minimum of 90 minutes per day.
Title
Relates to providing voice communication service to incarcerated people in state correctional facilities at no cost; requires agencies charged with the operation and management of state correctional facilities and juvenile detention facilities to provide persons in their custody with voice communication service at a minimum of 90 minutes per day.
Sponsors
Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] | Asm. Walter Mosley [D] | Asm. Dan Quart [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | Assembly | print number 7658b |
2020-12-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to correction |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | print number 7658a |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to correction |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S06276 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION