NY A07662 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - ordered to third reading rules cal.307
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - ordered to third reading rules cal.307
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits hotels from making available to its hotel guests small plastic bottles containing hospitality personal care products; imposes a monetary penalty for violation of such prohibition after notice, and a hearing or opportunity to be heard.
Title
Prohibits hotels from making available to its hotel guests small plastic bottles containing hospitality personal care products; imposes a monetary penalty for violation of such prohibition after notice, and a hearing or opportunity to be heard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.307 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | substituted for a7662b |
2020-07-23 | Senate | referred to codes |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.885 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 5282B |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 5282A |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted by s5282b |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.307 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.307 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reference changed to codes |
2020-07-18 | Assembly | print number 7662b |
2020-07-18 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 7662a |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05282 (Same As) 2020-07-23 - ordered to third reading rules cal.307