NY A07674 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.401
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.401
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a restricted dental faculty license, makes such provisions permanent.
Title
Relates to a restricted dental faculty license, makes such provisions permanent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.401 |
2019-10-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-03 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-03 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.463 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | substituted for a7674 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | referred to higher education |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.476 |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s3809 |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.463 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S03809 (Same As) 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.401