NY A07675 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.585
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.585
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the conducting of public hearings and reports thereon prior to the permanent closure of a park or historic site owned, held or administered by the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation.
Title
Requires the conducting of public hearings and reports thereon prior to the permanent closure of a park or historic site owned, held or administered by the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.585 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.182 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a7675a |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 183B |
2019-06-14 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-14 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1280 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 183A |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s183b |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7675a |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.182 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.182 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S00183 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.585