NY A07689 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - signed chap.221
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - signed chap.221
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage by regulation open seasons, size and catch limits and manner of taking of all species of fish.
Title
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage by regulation open seasons, size and catch limits and manner of taking of all species of fish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Senate | signed chap.221 |
2019-08-23 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1269 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6348 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.569 |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06348 (Same As) 2019-08-30 - signed chap.221