NY A07692 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.81
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.81
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions relating to the department of environmental conservation's management of aquatic invasive species, spread prevention and penalties.
Title
Extends provisions relating to the department of environmental conservation's management of aquatic invasive species, spread prevention and penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.81 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-06 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-06 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-06 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.570 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | substituted for a7692 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.773 |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | substituted by s5937 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.570 |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05937 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.81