NY A07706 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - ordered to third reading rules cal.189
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes and empowers the town of DeWitt to adopt and amend local laws to impose an occupancy tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes and empowers the town of DeWitt to adopt and amend local laws to impose an occupancy tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.189
2019-06-12Assemblyrules report cal.189
2019-06-12Assemblyreported
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-05-16Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S06149 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - PRINT NUMBER 6149A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback