NY A07709 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - SIGNED CHAP.441
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - SIGNED CHAP.441
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the effectiveness of providing uniform polling hours during primary elections.
Title
Relates to the effectiveness of providing uniform polling hours during primary elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.441 |
2019-10-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.190 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | substituted for a7709 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.906 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s6163 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.190 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.190 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S06163 (Same As) 2019-10-30 - SIGNED CHAP.441