NY A07710 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - substituted by s5855
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the department of environmental conservation, with the assistance of the department of transportation, to conduct a study on the environmental and human health impacts of John F. Kennedy international airport and LaGuardia airport.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the department of environmental conservation, with the assistance of the department of transportation, to conduct a study on the environmental and human health impacts of John F. Kennedy international airport and LaGuardia airport.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s5855
2019-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.628
2019-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.628
2019-06-19Assemblyreported
2019-06-19Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-18Assemblyreference changed to ways and means
2019-05-16Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S05855 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback