NY A07715 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.224
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the "September eleventh, two thousand one remembrance" distinctive license plate program; establishes the World Trade Center memorial scholarship fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the "September eleventh, two thousand one remembrance" distinctive license plate program; establishes the World Trade Center memorial scholarship fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24Senatesigned chap.224
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-04SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-04Senate3RD READING CAL.796
2018-06-04SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6072B
2018-05-31SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2018-05-31Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-05-31Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-24Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.951
2018-05-22Assemblyreported
2018-05-09Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-04-26Assemblyprint number 7715b
2018-04-26Assemblyamend and recommit to transportation
2018-02-22Assemblyprint number 7715a
2018-02-22Assemblyamend and recommit to transportation
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to transportation
2017-05-10Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S06072 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7715B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07715&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07715&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07715
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07715&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07715A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07715&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07715B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07715&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07715&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07715&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A7715#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback