NY A07715 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - SIGNED CHAP.711
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - SIGNED CHAP.711
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for an increase in the 911 telephone service surcharge in Madison county of sixty-five cents per month and sixty-five cents per retail sale.
Title
Provides for an increase in the 911 telephone service surcharge in Madison county of sixty-five cents per month and sixty-five cents per retail sale.
Sponsors
Asm. John Salka [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.711 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.654 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a7715b |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1779 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 5698A |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5698a |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.654 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | print number 7715b |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | print number 7715a |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S05698 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - SIGNED CHAP.711