NY A07716 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-12 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-12 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town board of Marbletown to hold meetings in the town of Rosendale and the town justice court of Marbletown to hold justice court in the town of Rosendale.
Title
Authorizes the town board of Marbletown to hold meetings in the town of Rosendale and the town justice court of Marbletown to hold justice court in the town of Rosendale.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.648 |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | reported |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-01-29 | Assembly | print number 7716a |
2014-01-29 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | home rule request |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | home rule request |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.377 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.377 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S05685 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES