NY A07718 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the payment of the annual contributions owed and to be owed on behalf of the New York city off-track betting corporation to the New York city employees' retirement system.
Title
Provides for the payment of the annual contributions owed and to be owed on behalf of the New York city off-track betting corporation to the New York city employees' retirement system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04913 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - PRINT NUMBER 4913B