NY A07723 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a quorum of the state camp safety advisory council.
Title
Relates to a quorum of the state camp safety advisory council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.330 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.191 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | substituted for a7723 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | referred to health |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.763 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s5568 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.191 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.191 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05568 (Same As) 2019-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.330