NY A07733 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - substituted by s5913
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - substituted by s5913
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the bridge on United States route 219, crossing the Cattaraugus creek, in the counties of Cattaraugus and Erie, as the "Gerard 'Jess' Fitzpatrick Memorial Bridge".
Title
Designates the bridge on United States route 219, crossing the Cattaraugus creek, in the counties of Cattaraugus and Erie, as the "Gerard 'Jess' Fitzpatrick Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Assembly | substituted by s5913 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.306 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.306 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05913 (Same As) 2017-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.149