NY A07750 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - SIGNED CHAP.92
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - SIGNED CHAP.92
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of taxation and finance to cooperate with investigations by certain committees of the United States Congress under certain circumstances.
Title
Requires the commissioner of taxation and finance to cooperate with investigations by certain committees of the United States Congress under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.92 |
2019-07-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-22 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-22 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.64 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | substituted for a7750 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.825 |
2019-05-19 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | substituted by s6146 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.64 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.64 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06146 (Same As) 2019-07-08 - SIGNED CHAP.92