NY A07752 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Ramapo to file an application for exemption from real property taxes for a certain parcel of land located at 120 Tome Valley Road in the town of Ramapo.
Title
Authorizes the town of Ramapo to file an application for exemption from real property taxes for a certain parcel of land located in the town of Ramapo, county of Rockland.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 108 N: 31 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2010-03-08 | delivered to senate | |
2010-03-08 | passed assembly | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.519 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-06-18 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-17 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-17 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-17 | ordered to third reading rules cal.432 | |
2009-06-17 | rules report cal.432 | |
2009-06-17 | reported | |
2009-06-17 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-06-02 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-05-29 | print number 7752a | |
2009-05-29 | amend and recommit to real property taxation | |
2009-04-23 | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S5317-A (Same As) 2010-03-12 - PRINT NUMBER 5317A