NY A07752 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-25 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-25 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a tax check-off box on personal income tax and corporate franchise tax returns for gifts to the New York state horse retirement and rescue fund; and directs the commissioner of agriculture and markets to compile a list of approved horse retirement and rescue programs.
Title
Provides for a tax check-off box on personal income tax and corporate franchise tax returns for gifts to the New York state horse retirement and rescue fund; and directs the commissioner of agriculture and markets to compile a list of approved horse retirement and rescue programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7752a |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.380 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.280 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.280 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05430 (Same As) 2014-03-13 - PRINT NUMBER 5430A