NY A07752 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - signed chap.104
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the transport of pistols or revolvers by licensees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the transport of pistols or revolvers by licensees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 99 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16Senatesigned chap.104
2019-07-15Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.983
2019-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6151
2019-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-12Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.192
2019-06-12Assemblyrules report cal.192
2019-06-12Assemblyreported
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-05-20Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S06151 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7752

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07752&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07752&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07752
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07752&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07752&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07752&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A7752#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback