NY A07772 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.308
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.308
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the discontinuance of park land of a portion of subsurface real property in the city of New York and grants easements to the metropolitan transportation authority to enable the New York city transit authority to use such lands for the construction of a new subsurface electrical substation adjacent to the existing tunnel of the A, C, E subway lines to provide power to enable additional subway trains to be operated.
Title
Authorizes the discontinuance of park land of a portion of subsurface real property in the city of New York and grants easements to the metropolitan transportation authority to enable the New York city transit authority to use such lands for the construction of a new subsurface electrical substation adjacent to the existing tunnel of the A, C, E subway lines to provide power to enable additional subway trains to be operated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.308 |
2019-09-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.462 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | substituted for a7772a |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1620 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6312A |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s6312a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.462 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.462 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | print number 7772a |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to cities |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S06312 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.308