NY A07779 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - approval memo.53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - approval memo.53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an annual report on appliance and equipment energy efficiency standards and resulting energy and utility bill savings.
Title
Requires an annual report on appliance and equipment energy efficiency standards and resulting energy and utility bill savings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Senate | approval memo.53 |
2019-12-16 | Senate | signed chap.666 |
2019-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.908 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5866 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.194 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.194 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S05866 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - approval memo.53