NY A07782 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - print number 7782a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - print number 7782a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing certain members of the New York city police pension fund to borrow from contributions.
Title
Relates to allowing certain members of the New York city police pension fund to borrow from contributions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Assembly | print number 7782a |
2020-07-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05906 (Same As) 2020-04-08 - PRINT NUMBER 5906B