NY A07789 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.408
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.408
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing insurance limits for certain for-hire vehicles; includes injury to or destruction of property under such limits.
Title
Relates to increasing insurance limits for certain for-hire vehicles; includes injury to or destruction of property under such limits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.408 |
2019-10-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.195 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | substituted for a7789 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | AMENDED (T) 5329A |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.1079 |
2019-04-26 | Assembly | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s5329a |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.195 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.195 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05329 (Same As) 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.408