NY A07791 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - print number 7791b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - print number 7791b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the rebates for stock transfer tax paid; dedicates funds of the stock transfer tax fund and stock transfer incentive fund to various funds; establishes the safe water and infrastructure action program.
Title
Repeals the rebates for stock transfer tax paid; dedicates funds of the stock transfer tax fund and stock transfer incentive fund to various funds; establishes the safe water and infrastructure action program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Assembly | print number 7791b |
2020-07-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | print number 7791a |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06203 (Same As) 2020-06-26 - PRINT NUMBER 6203A