NY A07793 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts various provisions relating to procurement procedures.
Title
Enacts various provisions relating to procurement procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-06 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05624 (Same As) 2020-02-07 - PRINT NUMBER 5624A