NY A07795 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - SIGNED CHAP.97
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - SIGNED CHAP.97
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the award of contracts to small businesses, minority-owned business enterprises and women-owned business enterprises; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Title
Relates to the award of contracts to small businesses, minority-owned business enterprises and women-owned business enterprises; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.97 |
2019-07-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.656 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a7795 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1790 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6301 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.656 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06301 (Same As) 2019-07-15 - SIGNED CHAP.97