NY A07797 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - SIGNED CHAP.95
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - SIGNED CHAP.95
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits race discrimination based on natural hair or hairstyles; defines "race" for certain specific purposes to include, but not be limited to, ancestry, color, ethnic group identification, and ethnic background, and to include traits historically associated with race, including but not limited to, hair texture and protective hairstyles; and defines "protective hairstyles" to include, but not be limited to, such hairstyles as braids, locks, and twists.
Title
Prohibits race discrimination based on natural hair or hairstyles; defines "race" for certain specific purposes to include, but not be limited to, ancestry, color, ethnic group identification, and ethnic background, and to include traits historically associated with race, including but not limited to, hair texture and protective hairstyles; and defines "protective hairstyles" to include, but not be limited to, such hairstyles as braids, locks, and twists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.95 |
2019-07-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.657 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a7797a |
2019-06-17 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1438 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6209A |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6209a |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.657 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reference changed to codes |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | print number 7797a |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06209 (Same As) 2019-07-12 - SIGNED CHAP.95