NY A07800 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - substituted by s6000a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to definitions and conforming changes pertaining to anatomical gifts (Part A); gift revocation (Part B); dispositions of gifts (Part C); documents of gifts (Part D); duties of donees (Part E); advance directives (Part F); and prohibition of sales of organs (Part G).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to definitions and conforming changes pertaining to anatomical gifts (Part A); gift revocation (Part B); dispositions of gifts (Part C); documents of gifts (Part D); duties of donees (Part E); advance directives (Part F); and prohibition of sales of organs (Part G).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s6000a
2019-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.658
2019-06-20Assemblyreported
2019-06-17Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-14Assemblyprint number 7800a
2019-06-14Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-05-23Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S06000 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07800&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07800&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07800
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07800&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07800A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07800&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07800&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07800&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback