NY A07808 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates a moratorium on the annexation of agricultural land by certain localities for an industrial use for one year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates a moratorium on the annexation of agricultural land by certain localities for an industrial use for one year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-06-14Assemblyprint number 7808a
2019-06-14Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to local governments
2019-05-23Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S06295 (Same As) 2019-06-16 - PRINT NUMBER 6295A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback