NY A07810 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the use of electronic coupling when providing prearranged transportation services to allow a passenger to confirm the prearranged match through an interactive exchange of signals on both the driver's handheld device and the passenger's handheld device.
Title
Requires the use of electronic coupling when providing prearranged transportation services to allow a passenger to confirm the prearranged match through an interactive exchange of signals on both the driver's handheld device and the passenger's handheld device.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | print number 7810a |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06012 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES