NY A07811 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.606
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.606
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to commercial mobile radio and cellular telephone service providers; permits the commission of public service to designate any commercial mobile radio or cellular telephone service provider as an eligible telecommunications carrier for purposes of providing lifeline service.
Title
Relates to commercial mobile radio and cellular telephone service providers; permits the commission of public service to designate any commercial mobile radio or cellular telephone service provider as an eligible telecommunications carrier for purposes of providing lifeline service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.606 |
2019-12-06 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.31 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.517 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | substituted for a7811a |
2019-06-18 | Senate | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5782A |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.888 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s5782a |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.517 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.517 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | print number 7811a |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to rules |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S05782 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.606