NY A07815 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for supports and services for unaccompanied minors with no lawful immigration status including legal representation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for supports and services for unaccompanied minors with no lawful immigration status including legal representation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.603
2019-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.603
2019-06-19Assemblyreported
2019-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-16Assemblyprint number 7815b
2019-06-16Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-06-13Assemblyprint number 7815a
2019-06-13Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2019-05-30Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-23Assemblyreferred to social services

Same As/Similar To

S06225 (Same As) 2019-06-16 - PRINT NUMBER 6225B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07815&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07815&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07815
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07815&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07815A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07815&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07815B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07815&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07815&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07815&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07815&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback