NY A07824 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.302
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.302
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes BB/S Facilities Management Corporation to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Title
Authorizes BB/S Facilities Management Corporation to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Sponsors
Asm. Edward Ra [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.302 |
2019-09-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.518 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | substituted for a7824a |
2019-06-14 | Senate | referred to real property taxation |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5647B |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5647A |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.802 |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s5647b |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.518 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.518 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | print number 7824a |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05647 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.302