NY A07828 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - print number 7828a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - print number 7828a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires instruction in pedestrian and bicyclist safety as part of the drivers pre-licensing course to educate prospective licensees on how to safely pass a bicyclist on the road, use of bicycle lanes and the dangers of motorists to bicyclists and pedestrians.
Title
Requires instruction in pedestrian and bicyclist safety as part of the drivers pre-licensing course to educate prospective licensees on how to safely pass a bicyclist on the road, use of bicycle lanes and the dangers of motorists to bicyclists and pedestrians.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Assembly | print number 7828a |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05228 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - referred to transportation