NY A07830 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.255
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.255
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a task force on disasters to examine how insurers who write policies that cover loss of or damage to real property, personal property or other liabilities for loss of, damage to, or injury to persons or property in the state respond to disasters.
Title
Creates a task force on disasters to examine how insurers who write policies that cover loss of or damage to real property, personal property or other liabilities for loss of, damage to, or injury to persons or property in the state respond to disasters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.255 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.406 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a7830 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | referred to insurance |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-01-23 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.22 |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s1634 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.406 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.406 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S01634 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.255