NY A07849 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.225
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to a real property tax exemption for Kehillas B'nai HaYeshivos.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to a real property tax exemption for Kehillas B'nai HaYeshivos.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24Senatesigned chap.225
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-12SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-12Senate3RD READING CAL.1698
2018-06-12SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S13B
2018-03-26SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2018-03-26Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-03-26Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.553
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.449
2017-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.449
2017-06-19Assemblyreported
2017-06-15Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-06-14Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-05-31Assemblyprint number 7849a
2017-05-31Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to real property taxation
2017-05-17Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

Same As/Similar To

S00013 (Same As) 2018-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7849A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07849&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07849&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07849
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07849&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07849A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07849&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07849&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07849&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07849&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A7849#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback