NY A07851 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - SIGNED CHAP.371
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - SIGNED CHAP.371
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of New Hartford, county of Oneida to alienate and convey certain parcels of land used as parkland.
Title
Authorizes the town of New Hartford, county of Oneida to alienate and convey certain parcels of land used as parkland.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.371 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.695 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a7851a |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5865A |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.945 |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5865a |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.695 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | print number 7851a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S05865 (Same As) 2019-10-11 - SIGNED CHAP.371