NY A07856 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.281
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.281
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits regulatory agencies to adjust any authorized fares to account for credit card processing fees for meters used in for-hire vehicles and requires credit card processing fees to be separately stated on receipts to passengers of such vehicles.
Title
Permits regulatory agencies to adjust any authorized fares to account for credit card processing fees for meters used in for-hire vehicles and requires credit card processing fees to be separately stated on receipts to passengers of such vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.281 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.660 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7856b |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMENDED BY RESTORING TO PREVIOUS PRINT 5932A |
2019-06-13 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5932B |
2019-06-12 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5932A |
2019-06-12 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-12 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1262 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5932a |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.660 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | amended by restoring to previous print 7856b |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | print number 7856c |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | print number 7856b |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | print number 7856a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05962 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
S05932 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.281
S05932 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.281