NY A07892 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - SIGNED CHAP.253
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - SIGNED CHAP.253
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the period of time to file an application for an accidental death benefit after the death of a member of the New York state and local employees' retirement system or the New York state and local police and fire retirement system.
Title
Extends the period of time to file an application for an accidental death benefit after the death of a member of the New York state and local employees' retirement system or the New York state and local police and fire retirement system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.253 |
2019-09-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.200 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a7892 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1445 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s6313 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.200 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.200 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06313 (Same As) 2019-09-11 - SIGNED CHAP.253