NY A07893 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - print number 7893a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - print number 7893a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the comptroller shall cause, in accordance with the rules and regulations promulgated by the comptroller, that a state employee's net salary may be deposited directly in a bank for any purpose to an account in the name of such employee.
Title
Provides that the comptroller shall cause, in accordance with the rules and regulations promulgated by the comptroller, that a state employee's net salary may be deposited directly in a bank for any purpose to an account in the name of such employee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | Assembly | print number 7893a |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05447 (Same As) 2020-03-04 - PRINT NUMBER 5447A