NY A07906 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.226
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Makes permanent certain provisions of the alcoholic beverage control law authorizing the sale of gift bags and wrapping, and manufacturers to transport alcoholic beverages to their retail establishments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes permanent certain provisions of the alcoholic beverage control law authorizing the sale of gift bags and wrapping, and manufacturers to transport alcoholic beverages to their retail establishments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24Senatesigned chap.226
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-03-28SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-03-28SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-03-28Senate3RD READING CAL.434
2018-03-28SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5962
2018-01-29SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2018-01-29Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-01-29Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.615
2018-01-23Assemblyreported
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to economic development
2017-05-18Assemblyreferred to economic development

Same As/Similar To

S05962 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7906

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback