NY A07906 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.227
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.227
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for restricted clinical laboratory licenses for individuals employed in a department of health authorized toxicology laboratory, operating under the direction of a clinical laboratory director.
Title
Provides for restricted clinical laboratory licenses for individuals employed in a department of health authorized toxicology laboratory, operating under the direction of a clinical laboratory director.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.227 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.556 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7906a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5692A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-05 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-30 | Senate | referred to higher education |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.833 |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5692a |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.556 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.556 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | print number 7906a |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S05692 (Same As) 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.227