NY A07915 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to allowing donate life registration when applying for or renewing a hunting, fishing or trapping license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to allowing donate life registration when applying for or renewing a hunting, fishing or trapping license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-02-26SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-02-26Senate3RD READING CAL.424
2020-02-26SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7318
2020-02-12SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2020-02-12Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-02-12Assemblypassed assembly
2020-01-08Assemblyordered to third reading cal.293
2020-01-08SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-01-08SenateDIED IN SENATE
2019-06-17SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-17Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-17Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-12Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.201
2019-06-12Assemblyrules report cal.201
2019-06-12Assemblyreported
2019-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-03Assemblyprint number 7915a
2019-06-03Assemblyamend and recommit to environmental conservation
2019-05-28Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S04471 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
S07318 (Same As) 2020-02-26 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7915A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07915&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07915&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07915
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07915&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07915A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07915&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07915&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07915&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A7915#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback