NY A07927 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes technical corrections to the block numbers of the authorization of an airport mass transport project at LaGuardia airport.
Title
Makes technical corrections to the block numbers of the authorization of an airport mass transport project at LaGuardia airport.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | committed to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.295 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.293 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.293 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |